IL SB2378 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-05 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0179
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-05 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0179
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act and the Retailers' Occupation Tax Act. Provides that the time limitation period on the Department of Revenue's right to file a notice of lien shall not run during the term of a repayment plan that taxpayer has entered into with the Department, as long as taxpayer remains in compliance with the terms of the repayment plan. Effective immediately.
Title
REVENUE-COLLECTION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 56 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 56 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 56 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-05 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0179 |
2013-08-05 | Senate | Effective Date August 5, 2013 |
2013-08-05 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2013-06-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-31 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2013-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 056-001-000 |
2013-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 056-001-000 |
2013-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt State Government and Veterans Affairs; 008-000-000 |
2013-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt State Government and Veterans Affairs; 008-000-000 |
2013-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2013-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2013-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2013-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Melinda Bush |
2013-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2013-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Melinda Bush |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 - May 31, 2013 |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 |
2013-05-30 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-001 |
2013-05-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2013-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 020-000-000 |
2013-05-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee |
2013-05-29 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2013-05-29 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2013-05-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-05-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2013-05-28 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-28 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-28 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-28 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-004-000 |
2013-05-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote |
2013-05-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2013-05-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-05-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
2013-05-24 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2013 |
2013-05-10 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 24, 2013 |
2013-04-24 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2013-04-22 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2013-04-22 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2013-04-12 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-04-12 | House | First Reading |
2013-04-12 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
2013-04-11 | House | Arrived in House |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000 |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 10, 2013 |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 14, 2013 |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Do Pass Revenue; 010-000-000 |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 120 | 5a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 5 | 1101 | Amended Code | Citation Text |