IL SB2355 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 15 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0568
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 15 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0568
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. Provides that a contracting entity may not sell, lease, rent, or otherwise grant access to the dental services of a participating provider under a dental services contract unless expressly authorized by the dental services contract. Requires a contracting entity to make certain disclosures to the participating provider. Provides that any contract entered into or renewed on or after the effective date of the amendatory Act shall require that any time a contracting entity leases, rents, or otherwise grants access to the dental services of a participating provider it must allow the participating provider the option to refuse to continue to provide services to third-parties entities that have bought, leased, rented, or otherwise been granted access to the health care services of a participating provider by the contracting entity. Requires contracting entities to timely update their provider directories to reflect participating providers who have refused to continue to provide services. Requires third parties who contract with contracting entities to provide certain information to participating providers.
Title
INS CD-DENTAL SERVICE PROVIDER
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-15 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0568 |
2016-07-15 | Senate | Effective Date July 15, 2016 |
2016-07-15 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2016-06-22 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2016-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2016-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2016-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2016-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2016-05-24 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000 |
2016-05-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-19 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-17 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Insurance Committee; 012-000-000 |
2016-05-13 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 27, 2016 |
2016-05-09 | House | Assigned to Insurance Committee |
2016-04-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2016-04-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-22 | House | First Reading |
2016-04-22 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes |
2016-04-22 | House | Arrived in House |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 051-000-000 |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Matt Murphy |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 13, 2016 |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Second Reading |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 7, 2016 |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Insurance; 011-000-000 |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Insurance |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Assigned to Insurance |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-01-28 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes |