IL SB2336 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-09-04 - Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Property Tax Code. In a Section concerning tax objections, provides that, when a change in assessed valuation of $100,000 or more is sought: (i) on the date the initial complaint is filed, the plaintiff shall send a copy of the complaint to the custodian of funds of each of the taxing districts against which the complaint is directed; and (ii) each of the taxing districts shall have the unconditional right to intervene in the cause of action. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PROP TX-TAXING DISTRICTS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-04SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
2018-04-13SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-03-01SenatePostponed - Revenue
2018-02-27SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire
2018-02-21SenatePostponed - Revenue
2018-02-08SenatePostponed - Revenue
2018-02-06SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2018-01-30SenateAssigned to Revenue
2018-01-24SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-01-24SenateFirst Reading
2018-01-24SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Karen McConnaughay

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3520023-10Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback