IL SB2336 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. In a Section concerning tax objections, provides that, when a change in assessed valuation of $100,000 or more is sought: (i) on the date the initial complaint is filed, the plaintiff shall send a copy of the complaint to the custodian of funds of each of the taxing districts against which the complaint is directed; and (ii) each of the taxing districts shall have the unconditional right to intervene in the cause of action. Effective immediately.
Title
PROP TX-TAXING DISTRICTS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-09-04 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Postponed - Revenue |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Postponed - Revenue |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Postponed - Revenue |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-01-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Karen McConnaughay |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 200 | 23-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2336&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2336.htm |