IL SB2333 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 28 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-31 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-31 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Security Deposit Return Act. Provides that certain lessors may not withhold any part of the security deposit without providing, among other things, the paid receipts for the depreciated value of damage if the damage is beyond repair and not replaced. Defines "the date that the lessee vacated the premises" as the date on which the lessee's right to possess and occupy the premises expires, either under provisions of the lease or under other applicable law. Provides that the Section concerning the requirements a lessor must meet in order to withhold part of the security deposit does not apply to a tenancy at sufferance or if a lease has been terminated for cause by the lessor.
Title
RETURN OF SECURITY DEPOSIT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-31 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2016-07-31 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2016 |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 13, 2016 |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Postponed - Judiciary |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 19, 2016 |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Second Reading |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dave Syverson |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 7, 2016 |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Judiciary; 009-000-000 |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dave Syverson |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Judiciary |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Postponed - Judiciary |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dave Syverson |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Postponed - Judiciary |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Postponed - Judiciary |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Postponed - Judiciary |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-01-28 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dave Syverson |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
765 | 710 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |