IL SB2290 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 1 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill with changes. Allows the Illinois Innovation Voucher Program to be administered by a governmental entity with expertise in innovation, technology, economic development, research and development, and public private partnerships. Provides that the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity, subject to appropriation, shall be authorized to provide to the entity administering the Program an administrative fee in an amount not to exceed 10% (rather than 15%) of the total value of vouchers estimated by the Department to be issued in each fiscal year. Makes the awarding of innovation vouchers subject to appropriation. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DCEO-INNOVATION VOUCHER PROG

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-01 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 45 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 45 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-30SenateSent to the Governor
2021-06-01SenatePassed Both Houses
2021-06-01SenateSenate Concurs
2021-06-01SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Senate Concurs 045-011-000
2021-06-01SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 045-011-000
2021-06-01SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 3/5 Vote Required
2021-06-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patrick J. Joyce
2021-05-31SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner
2021-05-31SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
2021-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt State Government; 006-003-000
2021-05-30SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt State Government; 006-003-000
2021-05-25SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to State Government
2021-05-25SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to State Government
2021-05-25SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2021-05-25SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2021-05-25SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2021-05-25SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2021-05-21SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 3 - May 24, 2021
2021-05-21SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 3
2021-05-20HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2021-05-20HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
2021-05-20HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 117-000-000
2021-05-19HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2021-05-19HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted
2021-05-19HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2021-05-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000
2021-05-13HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
2021-05-13HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield
2021-05-13HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2021-05-12HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2021-05-12HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 008-000-000
2021-05-12HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in State Government Administration Committee; by Voice Vote
2021-05-12HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne Ness
2021-05-12HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
2021-05-12HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee
2021-05-11HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2021-05-11HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield
2021-05-11HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2021-05-11HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield
2021-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2021-05-10HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Rita Mayfield
2021-05-04HouseAssigned to State Government Administration Committee
2021-04-27HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-04-27HouseFirst Reading
2021-04-26HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2021-04-26HouseArrived in House
2021-04-23SenateThird Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
2021-04-22SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 23, 2021
2021-04-22SenateSecond Reading
2021-04-21SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 22, 2021
2021-04-21SenateDo Pass as Amended State Government; 009-000-000
2021-04-21SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2021-04-20SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2021-04-20SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government
2021-04-16SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 23, 2021
2021-04-16SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2021-04-16SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2021-03-23SenateAssigned to State Government
2021-02-26SenateReferred to Assignments
2021-02-26SenateFirst Reading
2021-02-26SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Scott M. Bennett

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20605605-1055New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2290&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB2290.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB2290eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB2290enr.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB2290sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB2290ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB2290ham002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB2290ham003.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/102/senate/10200SB2290_04232021_025000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/102/house/10200SB2290_05202021_028000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/102/senate/10200SB2290ham003_06012021_020001C.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/102/senate/10200SB2290ham001_06012021_020000C.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback