IL SB2263 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on November 7 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-12-04 - Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the State Officials and Employees Ethics Act. Removes provisions allowing for the appointment of members of the General Assembly to the Legislative Ethics Commission. Provides that the appointing authorities shall appoint commissioners from the general public who have experience holding governmental office or employment. Provides that a person is not eligible to serve as a commissioner if that person (i) has been convicted of a felony or a crime of dishonesty or moral turpitude; (ii) is, or was within the preceding 10 years, engaged in activities that require registration under the Lobbyist Registration Act; (iii) is related to the appointing authority; (iv) is or has been within the preceding 10 years a State officer, a State employee, or an employee or member of the General Assembly; or (v) holds a partisan elected or political party office, or is otherwise an officer or employee of a political committee or political campaign. Provides that no commissioner or employee of the Legislative Ethics Commission may, among other restrictions, be actively involved in the affairs of any political committee or political campaign. Makes conforming changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ETHICS-LEGIS ETHICS COMMISSION

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-04SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
2018-05-03SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-04-27SenateRule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018
2018-04-19SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo
2018-04-13SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018
2018-01-30SenateTo Subcommittee on Special Issues (EX)
2018-01-24SenateAssigned to Executive
2017-11-29SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2017-11-27SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver
2017-11-07SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-11-07SenateFirst Reading
2017-11-07SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Tim Bivins

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
543025-5Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback