IL SB2231 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-5)
Status: Passed on August 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-12 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0315
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-5)
Status: Passed on August 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-12 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0315
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides for enhanced penalties for criminal damage to property and criminal defacement of property if the property damaged or defaced are individual graves, gravestones, or markers or property which memorializes or honors a person or group, including police officers, fire fighters, veterans, or historic figures.
Title
CRIM CD-DAMAGE&DEFACEMENT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-12 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0315 |
2013-08-12 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2014 |
2013-08-12 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2013-06-19 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2013-05-21 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000 |
2013-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2013-05-13 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2013-05-10 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jil Tracy |
2013-05-10 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti |
2013-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katherine Cloonen |
2013-05-10 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jil Tracy |
2013-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti |
2013-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jil Tracy |
2013-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeanne M Ives |
2013-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Ed Sullivan, Jr. |
2013-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2013-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2013-05-09 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-09 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2013-05-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-08 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary; 016-000-000 |
2013-05-02 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2013-04-29 | House | Assigned to Judiciary |
2013-04-29 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-04-29 | House | First Reading |
2013-04-24 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2013-04-24 | House | Arrived in House |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 23, 2013 |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 18, 2013 |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Criminal Law; 008-000-000 |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Criminal Law |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 19, 2013 |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Reported Back To Criminal Law; 003-000-000 |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2013-03-13 | Senate | To Subcommittee on CLEAR Compliance |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 21-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 21-1.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |