IL SB2225 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-06 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-06 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Makes reappropriations from the Capital Development Fund to the Capital Development Board for the Department of Veterans' Affairs relating to veterans' home construction and planning and other capital improvements. Provides that the appropriation authority is valid for costs incurred from July 1, 2015 through June 30, 2016. Effective immediately.
Title
$VETERANS' HOME FACILITY
Sponsors
Sen. John Mulroe [D] | Sen. Thomas Cullerton [D] | Sen. Michael Hastings [D] | Sen. Mattie Hunter [D] |
Sen. Donne Trotter [D] | Sen. Antonio Munoz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter |
2016-01-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2016-01-29 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2016-01-29 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-01-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2225&GAID=13&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/SB/PDF/09900SB2225.pdf |