IL SB2218 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on October 29 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-29 - Total Veto Stands
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on October 29 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-29 - Total Veto Stands
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Addison Creek Restoration Commission Act. Extends the repeal of the Act to January 1, 2015 (instead of January 1, 2010).
Title
ADDISON CREEK-EXTEND REPEAL
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-05-31 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 34 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 34 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 34 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 34 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 34 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 34 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-10-29 | Total Veto Stands | |
2009-10-14 | Placed Calendar Total Veto October 15, 2009 | |
2009-08-28 | Governor Vetoed | |
2009-06-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-06-01 | Passed Both Houses | |
2009-06-01 | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Senate Concurs 037-022-000 | |
2009-06-01 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 037-022-000 | |
2009-06-01 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 037-022-000 | |
2009-05-31 | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments | |
2009-05-31 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments | |
2009-05-31 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments | |
2009-05-31 | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments | |
2009-05-31 | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Donne E. Trotter | |
2009-05-31 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments | |
2009-05-31 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Donne E. Trotter | |
2009-05-31 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments | |
2009-05-31 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Donne E. Trotter | |
2009-05-31 | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Donne E. Trotter | |
2009-05-31 | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2, 3 - May 31, 2009 | |
2009-05-31 | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2, 3 | |
2009-05-31 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-002-000 | |
2009-05-31 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-05-31 | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted by Voice Vote | |
2009-05-31 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted by Voice Vote | |
2009-05-31 | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-002-000 | |
2009-05-31 | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-05-31 | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie | |
2009-05-31 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-05-31 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-05-31 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 007-004-000 | |
2009-05-30 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Executive Committee | |
2009-05-30 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-05-30 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie | |
2009-05-27 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-05-27 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-05-27 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-05-27 | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-004-000 | |
2009-05-27 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote | |
2009-05-27 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Executive Committee | |
2009-05-26 | Motion to Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed by Voice Vote | |
2009-05-26 | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 25 Executive Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie | |
2009-05-26 | Assigned to Executive Committee | |
2009-05-26 | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2009 | |
2009-05-08 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-04-28 | Assigned to Executive Committee | |
2009-04-28 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-04-28 | First Reading | |
2009-04-27 | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie | |
2009-04-03 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2009-04-03 | Arrived in House | |
2009-04-02 | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-001 | |
2009-04-01 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** April 2, 2009 | |
2009-03-30 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 31, 2009 | |
2009-03-30 | Second Reading | |
2009-03-12 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 17, 2009 | |
2009-03-12 | Do Pass Local Government; 009-000-000 | |
2009-03-04 | Assigned to Local Government | |
2009-02-20 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-02-20 | First Reading | |
2009-02-20 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |