IL SB2183 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on August 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-14 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0348
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on August 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-14 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0348
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Transportation Sustainability Procurement Program Act. Requires the Bureau of Strategic Sourcing and Procurement in the Department of Central Management Services, in consultation with the Illinois Environmental Protection Agency, to develop a sustainability program for the State's procurement of freight, small package delivery, and other forms of cargo shipping and transportation services. Provides that State contracts for the procurement of those services shall require providers to report greenhouse gas emissions and energy consumption. Sets forth disclosure requirements that apply to the State's solicitations for those services. Requires the State to consider the bidder's environmental disclosures and the price and quality of the services to be provided. Amends the Illinois Procurement Code. Provides that, when procuring freight, small package delivery, and other forms of cargo shipping and transportation services, appropriate weight shall be given to the requirements of the Transportation Sustainability Procurement Program Act. Effective immediately.
Title
PROCUREMENT-CARGO SERVICES
Sponsors
Sen. Don Harmon [D] | Sen. Iris Martinez [D] | Rep. Elaine Nekritz [D] | Rep. Ronald Sandack [R] |
Rep. Carol Sente [D] | Rep. Anthony DeLuca [D] | Rep. Robyn Gabel [D] | Rep. Christian Mitchell [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-14 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0348 |
2013-08-14 | Senate | Effective Date August 14, 2013 |
2013-08-14 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2013-06-18 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-20 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2013-05-20 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000 |
2013-05-09 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2013-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2013-05-09 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-09 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-03 | House | Fiscal Note Filed |
2013-05-02 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2013-05-02 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol A. Sente |
2013-05-01 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 019-000-000 |
2013-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ron Sandack |
2013-04-24 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2013-04-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-04-17 | House | First Reading |
2013-04-17 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz |
2013-04-17 | House | Arrived in House |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 17, 2013 |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 19, 2013 |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Environment; 010-000-000 |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Environment |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Environment |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |