IL SB2182 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-16 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-16 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill with changes. Provides that a "qualifying Illinois data center" means a new or existing data center that, among other criteria, is located in the State of Illinois, is located within a 5-mile geographic radius, and is connected by common infrastructure. Provides that a data center and an associated tenant may enter into an ancillary memorandum of understanding, as prescribed by the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity, for purposes of receipt of an exemption. Provides that the Department is authorized to conform existing memorandums of understanding with the provisions concerning data center investments. Provides that within 180 days after the effective date of this amendatory Act of the 120nd General Assembly, all new and existing data centers seeking a certificate of exemption under this Section shall require the contractor to enter into a labor peace agreement with any union representing workers who operate and maintain a critical system or equipment used or maintained by the data center. Modifies the definition of "tenant". Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
DCEO-DATA CENTER INVESTMENT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 65 N: 42 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-16 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2021-05-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2021-05-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2021-05-29 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2021-05-29 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 - May 30, 2021 |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 |
2021-05-29 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 065-042-001 |
2021-05-29 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2021-05-29 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-28 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2021 |
2021-05-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000 |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Dale Fowler |
2021-05-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-05-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mark L. Walker |
2021-05-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Terri Bryant |
2021-05-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Craig Wilcox |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Win Stoller |
2021-05-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed as Amended |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Dan McConchie |
2021-05-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 State Debt Impact Note Filed as Amended |
2021-05-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2021-05-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 State Debt Impact Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2021-05-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2021-05-20 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-20 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 013-005-000 |
2021-05-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Revenue & Finance Committee; by Voice Vote |
2021-05-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2021-05-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-05-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mark L. Walker |
2021-05-13 | House | Committee/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 28, 2021 |
2021-05-13 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2021-05-11 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Tom Demmer |
2021-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke |
2021-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2021-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2021-05-05 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-05-05 | House | First Reading |
2021-05-05 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker |
2021-05-05 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 051-000-000 |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Craig Wilcox |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 7, 2021 |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 28, 2021 |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Sims |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 30, 2021 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Revenue; 010-000-000 |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Revenue |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terri Bryant |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 25, 2021 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Do Pass Revenue; 010-000-000 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Win Stoller |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 605 | 605-1025 | Amended Code | Citation Text |