IL SB2143 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-28 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0232
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-28 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0232
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Construction Law. Provides that a reorganized school district or cooperative high school may use a school construction grant application that was submitted by a school district that formed the reorganized school district or cooperative high school if that application has not been entitled for a project by the State Board of Education and if specified conditions are met within the current or prior 4 (instead of 2) fiscal years. Effective immediately.
Title
SCH CONSTRUCT-REORG DIST-APP
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-06 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-28 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0232 |
2011-07-28 | Senate | Effective Date July 28, 2011 |
2011-07-28 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2011-06-03 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2011-05-06 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2011-05-06 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000 |
2011-05-03 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-05-03 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-04-27 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-04-27 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 018-000-000 |
2011-04-12 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee |
2011-04-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-04-08 | House | First Reading |
2011-04-08 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Norine Hammond |
2011-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2011-04-08 | House | Arrived in House |
2011-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000 |
2011-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 14, 2011 |
2011-03-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2011-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 10, 2011 |
2011-03-09 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 009-000-000 |
2011-03-02 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2011-03-01 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John M. Sullivan |
2011-03-01 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Dan Kotowski |
2011-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-02-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-02-10 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John M. Sullivan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 230 | 5-25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |