IL SB2129 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0102
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0102
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963. Provides that at any time upon the recommendation of the State's Attorney of the county in which the defendant was sentenced, the State's Attorney may petition the sentencing court or the sentencing court's successor to resentence the offender if the original sentence no longer advances the interests of justice. Provides that the sentencing court or the sentencing court's successor may resentence the offender if it finds that the original sentence no longer advances the interests of justice. Provides that, upon receipt of a petition for resentencing, the court may resentence the defendant in the same manner as if the offender had not previously been sentenced; however, the new sentence, if any, may not be greater than the initial sentence. Provides that the court may consider postconviction factors, including, but not limited to, the inmate's disciplinary record and record of rehabilitation while incarcerated; evidence that reflects whether age, time served, and diminished physical condition, if any, have reduced the inmate's risk for future violence; and evidence that reflects changed circumstances since the inmate's original sentencing such that the inmate's continued incarceration no longer serves the interests of justice. Provides that credit shall be given for time served; that victims shall be afforded all rights as outlined in the Rights of Crime Victims and Witnesses Act; and that resentencing shall not reopen the defendant's conviction to challenges that would otherwise be barred. Provides that nothing in the new provisions shall be construed to limit the power of the Governor under the Constitution to grant a reprieve, commutation of sentence, or pardon.
Title
STATE RESENTENCING MOTION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 61 N: 48 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 31 N: 17 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 31 N: 17 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-15 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0102 |
2021-07-15 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2022 |
2021-07-15 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-29 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 061-048-000 |
2021-05-28 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2021 |
2021-05-19 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2021-05-19 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jawaharial Williams |
2021-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2021-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
2021-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2021-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2021-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2021-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2021-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2021-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2021-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker |
2021-05-13 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-13 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-06 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-06 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Restorative Justice Committee; 004-002-000 |
2021-04-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2021-04-28 | House | Assigned to Restorative Justice Committee |
2021-04-23 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-23 | House | First Reading |
2021-04-22 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2021-04-22 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 031-017-000 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 21, 2021 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 15, 2021 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 007-003-000 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert Peters |