IL SB2124 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-17 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-17 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Code. Provides, for tax years ending on or after December 31, 2021, a surcharge is imposed on an Illinois resident's low-taxed investment income. Defines "low-taxed investment income". Provides how the surcharge is calculated. Exempts from the surcharge: (i) resident married individuals filing joint returns, if Illinois taxable income is not more than $250,000; (ii) a resident head of household, if Illinois taxable income is not more than $200,000; and (iii) resident unmarried individuals, resident married individuals filing separate returns, and resident estates and trusts, if Illinois taxable income is not more than $150,000. Effective immediately.
Title
INC TX-CAPITAL GAINS SURCHARGE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-17 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert Peters |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 5 | 201 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2124&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB2124.htm |