IL SB2018 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that the Department of Corrections shall establish a Life Skills Reentry Center for Women. Provides that the Life Skills Reentry Center for Women shall build valuable life skills and prepare women committed persons for reentry into society while maintaining safety and security. Provides that the Center shall focus on committed persons who are ready to make needed changes in order to successfully reintegrate into their community upon release from the custody of the Department of Corrections. Provides that the Center shall offer educational, job readiness, and cognitive behavior therapy courses to women committed persons who have one to 4 years remaining on their sentence and qualify for placement at the Center. Provides that the Chief Administrator for the Women's Division of the Department of Corrections shall determine eligibility of women committed persons for the program and shall assign eligible committed persons to the Center based upon the conduct of the women committed at other correctional institutions, their desire to rehabilitate, and the likelihood of their non-recidivism. Provides that the programs offered at the Center include: prevocational and reentry related life skills, adult basic education, high school equivalency courses, literacy courses, creative writing courses, training for vocations, including welding, manufacturing, restaurant management, and custodial maintenance. Provides that women assigned to the Center may participate in Alcoholics Anonymous, other 12-step programs for recovery from alcoholism or substance use disorder, worship and chaplaincy services, religious studies, family days, job partnership programs, substance use disorder therapy programs, critical thinking, cultural self-awareness programs, and various mental health services, including art therapy.
Title
CD CORR-LIFE SKILLS TRAINING
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-01-07 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Re-assigned to State Government |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Postponed - State Government |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ann Gillespie |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
730 | 5 | 3-2-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 3-2-5.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2018&GAID=17&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/SB/10300SB2018.htm |