IL SB1996 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Chicago Teacher Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that an Employer or the Board of Trustees shall make pension deductions in each pay period on the basis of the salary earned in that period, exclusive of salaries for overtime, extracurricular activities (instead of special services), or any employment on an optional basis, such as summer school. Makes conforming changes. Effective immediately.
Title
PEN CD-CTPF-PENSION DEDUCTIONS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-01-20 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon |
2020-01-01 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2019-05-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Arthur Turner |
2019-05-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2019-05-07 | House | Re-assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2019-05-06 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Arthur Turner |
2019-05-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2019-04-30 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2019-04-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-11 | House | First Reading |
2019-04-11 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2019-04-11 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 10, 2019 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 14, 2019 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Do Pass Government Accountability and Ethics; 009-000-000 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Government Accountability and Ethics |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 5 | 17-131 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 17-132 | Amended Code | Citation Text |