IL SB1995 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-28 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0787
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-28 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0787
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Local Government Debt Reform Act. Provides that bonds issued by school districts for the purpose of purchasing, constructing, or improving real property may become due within 30 years, notwithstanding any other law.
Title
SCHOOL DEBT-30 YEARS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 49 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 49 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 86 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 49 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 86 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-28 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0787 | |
2009-08-28 | Effective Date August 28, 2009 | |
2009-08-28 | Governor Approved | |
2009-06-29 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-31 | Passed Both Houses | |
2009-05-31 | House Floor Amendment No. 5 Senate Concurs 054-002-001 | |
2009-05-31 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 054-002-001 | |
2009-05-31 | House Floor Amendment No. 5 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Local Government; 007-000-000 | |
2009-05-31 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Local Government; 007-000-000 | |
2009-05-31 | House Floor Amendment No. 5 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Local Government | |
2009-05-31 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Local Government | |
2009-05-30 | House Floor Amendment No. 5 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments | |
2009-05-30 | House Floor Amendment No. 5 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. A. J. Wilhelmi | |
2009-05-30 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments | |
2009-05-30 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. A. J. Wilhelmi | |
2009-05-30 | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 5 - May 31, 2009 | |
2009-05-30 | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 5 | |
2009-05-30 | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40(a) | |
2009-05-30 | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40(a) | |
2009-05-30 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 086-031-000 | |
2009-05-30 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-05-30 | House Floor Amendment No. 5 Adopted by Voice Vote | |
2009-05-30 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Withdrawn by Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia | |
2009-05-30 | House Floor Amendment No. 5 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 | |
2009-05-29 | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2009 | |
2009-05-29 | House Floor Amendment No. 5 Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-05-29 | House Floor Amendment No. 5 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia | |
2009-05-29 | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-05-29 | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia | |
2009-05-22 | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 29, 2009 | |
2009-05-21 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Counties & Townships Committee; 009-000-000 | |
2009-05-20 | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-05-20 | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia | |
2009-05-19 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Roger L. Eddy | |
2009-05-19 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-05-19 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-05-19 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack McGuire | |
2009-05-18 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Counties & Townships Committee | |
2009-05-13 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-05-13 | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-05-13 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-05-13 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia | |
2009-05-12 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-05-12 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-05-06 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-05-06 | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 | |
2009-05-06 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote | |
2009-05-06 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Executive Committee | |
2009-04-20 | Assigned to Executive Committee | |
2009-04-01 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-04-01 | First Reading | |
2009-04-01 | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia | |
2009-04-01 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2009-04-01 | Arrived in House | |
2009-04-01 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) | |
2009-04-01 | Third Reading - Passed; 054-001-001 | |
2009-03-30 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 31, 2009 | |
2009-03-30 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Wilhelmi | |
2009-03-30 | Second Reading | |
2009-03-19 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Local Government; 007-000-000 | |
2009-03-18 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Local Government | |
2009-03-17 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-17 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. A. J. Wilhelmi | |
2009-03-12 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 17, 2009 | |
2009-03-12 | Do Pass Local Government; 008-000-000 | |
2009-03-10 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-10 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. A. J. Wilhelmi | |
2009-03-04 | Assigned to Local Government | |
2009-02-20 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-02-20 | First Reading | |
2009-02-20 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. A. J. Wilhelmi |