IL SB1974 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that a person who, in committing a domestic battery, other than by discharge of a firearm, knows the individual battered to be a person 60 years of age or older commits aggravated domestic battery.
Title
CRIM CD-AGG DOMESTIC BATTERY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-01-07 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2024-02-07 | Senate | To Subcommittee on CLEAR Compliance |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Re-assigned to Special Committee on Criminal Law and Public Safety |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Seth Lewis |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Tom Bennett |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Craig Wilcox |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2023-03-30 | Senate | To Subcommittee on CLEAR Compliance |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Andrew S. Chesney |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Win Stoller |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Erica Harriss |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 31, 2023 |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Assigned to Special Committee on Criminal Law and Public Safety |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terri Bryant |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 12-3.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1974&GAID=17&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/SB/10300SB1974.htm |