IL SB1972 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 14 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-14 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0536
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 14 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-14 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0536
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Drainage Code. Provides that the commissioners of a drainage district must advertise for bids whenever the cost of any work to be performed by the district or the cost of specified materials and equipment exceeds $20,000 (now, $5,000). Effective immediately.
Title
DRAINAGE CD-BIDS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-05-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 76 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-14 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0536 | |
2009-08-14 | Effective Date August 14, 2009 | |
2009-08-14 | Governor Approved | |
2009-06-16 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-18 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock | |
2009-05-18 | Passed Both Houses | |
2009-05-18 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 076-028-001 | |
2009-05-12 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-05-12 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-04-30 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-04-30 | Do Pass / Short Debate Counties & Townships Committee; 008-000-000 | |
2009-04-22 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry L. Mitchell | |
2009-04-20 | Assigned to Counties & Townships Committee | |
2009-04-06 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-04-06 | First Reading | |
2009-04-03 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard | |
2009-04-03 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jil Tracy | |
2009-04-03 | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Richard P. Myers | |
2009-04-03 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2009-04-03 | Arrived in House | |
2009-04-02 | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 | |
2009-04-01 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** April 2, 2009 | |
2009-03-24 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 25, 2009 | |
2009-03-24 | Second Reading | |
2009-03-12 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 17, 2009 | |
2009-03-12 | Do Pass Local Government; 008-000-000 | |
2009-03-04 | Assigned to Local Government | |
2009-02-20 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-02-20 | First Reading | |
2009-02-20 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John M. Sullivan |