IL SB1905 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-1)
Status: Vetoed on September 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-12 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Collective Bargaining Freedom Act. Provides that it is the policy of the State that employers, employees, and their labor organizations are free to bargain collectively. Provides that the authority to enact laws or rules that restrict the use of union security agreements between an employer and a labor organization vests exclusively with the General Assembly. Prohibits local governments from enforcing any such law or rule. Defines terms. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

COLLECTIVE BARGAINING FREEDOM

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-07-04 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 40 N: 13 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 67 N: 38 NV: 9 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 36 N: 15 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-12SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2017-09-29SenateGovernor Vetoed
2017-08-02SenateSent to the Governor
2017-07-04SenatePassed Both Houses
2017-07-04SenateSenate Concurs
2017-07-04SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 040-013-000
2017-07-01SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2017-06-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2017-06-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Ira I. Silverstein
2017-06-29SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - June 30, 2017
2017-06-29SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
2017-06-29HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 067-038-000
2017-06-29HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-06-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-06-29HouseRecalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-06-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000
2017-06-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-06-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-06-26HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2017-06-25HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-31HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2017
2017-05-29HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Filed
2017-05-29HouseHome Rule Note Filed
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-26HouseFiscal Note Filed
2017-05-24HouseHousing Affordability Impact Note Filed
2017-05-24HouseJudicial Note Filed
2017-05-24HouseCorrectional Note Filed
2017-05-24HouseState Debt Impact Note Filed
2017-05-24HouseBalanced Budget Note Filed
2017-05-24HousePension Note Filed
2017-05-23HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-22HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-22HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2017-05-18HouseHome Rule Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-05-18HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-05-18HouseFiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-05-18HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-17HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 015-010-001
2017-05-17SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2017-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2017-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2017-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2017-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2017-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2017-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2017-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo
2017-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2017-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2017-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2017-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita
2017-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2017-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2017-05-16HouseAlternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jay Hoffman
2017-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps
2017-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang
2017-05-16HouseAlternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Lou Lang
2017-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2017-05-16HouseAlternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2017-05-16HouseAlternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Jay Hoffman
2017-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2017-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2017-05-16HouseAlternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Michael Halpin
2017-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2017-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2017-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang
2017-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2017-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2017-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser
2017-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2017-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2017-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-05-09HouseAssigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
2017-04-28HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-04-28HouseFirst Reading
2017-04-28HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-04-28HouseArrived in House
2017-04-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2017-04-27SenateThird Reading - Passed; 036-015-000
2017-04-27SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann
2017-04-27SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2017-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2017
2017-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Silverstein
2017-04-26SenateSecond Reading
2017-04-26SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2017-04-24SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2017-04-06SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Labor; 010-006-000
2017-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Labor
2017-03-31SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-31SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ira I. Silverstein
2017-03-17SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2017-03-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 16, 2017
2017-03-15SenateDo Pass Labor; 010-003-000
2017-03-09SenatePostponed - Labor
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Labor
2017-02-10SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-10SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-10SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Ira I. Silverstein

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback