IL SB1900 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-10 - Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-10 - Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Public-Private Partnerships Act. Creates provisions addressing agreements between public and private entities; transparency between parties; oversight of projects; compliance with state and federal law; and fairness for local jurisdictions when negotiating public-private agreements. Adds provisions containing rules for the formation of an public-private partnership agreement; the establishment of the Infrastructure Investment Commission; the process for procuring contracts; the terms of a public-private partnership agreement; the creation of development and operation standards for projects; the taxation of contractors; financial arrangements; the insurance of debt by a responsible public entity; the acquisition of property; law enforcement; confidentiality of proposals; the maximum term of a public-private agreement; reversion of property to the State; powers of a responsible public entity with respect to qualifying projects; and prohibited local action. Makes a corresponding change in the Freedom of Information Act.
Title
PUBLIC-PRIVATE PARTNERSHIP ACT
Sponsors
Sen. John Curran [R] | Sen. Elgie Sims [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John F. Curran |
2022-02-07 | Senate | To Executive- Procurement |
2022-01-05 | Senate | Re-assigned to Executive |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-03-24 | Senate | To Executive- Procurement |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John F. Curran |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 140 | 7.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |