IL SB1900 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-10-10 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-10-10 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Freedom of Information Act. To the list of records exempt from inspection and copying, adds records requested by persons committed to or detained by the Department of Human Services under the Sexually Violent Persons Commitment Act if those materials: (i) are available in the library of the facility where the individual is confined; (ii) include records from staff members' personnel files, staff rosters, or other staffing assignment information; or (iii) are available through an administrative request to the Department of Human Services. Effective immediately.
Title
FOIA-SEXUALLY VIOLENT PERSONS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-10 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2015-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2015 |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 15, 2015 |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 24, 2015 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Governmental Operations |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-02-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John M. Sullivan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 140 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1900&GAID=13&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/SB/09900SB1900.htm |