IL SB1892 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on June 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0241
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on June 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0241
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Metropolitan Transit Authority Act. In provisions concerning free services for seniors and persons with disabilities, provides that, after an initial eligibility determination is made, an individual's eligibility for free services shall automatically renew every 5 years after receipt by the Authority of a copy of the individual's government-issued identification card validating Illinois residency. Requires individuals who have not submitted an Illinois Persons with a Disability Identification Card to the Authority to also submit a document verifying the individual's disability. Makes similar changes in provisions of the Regional Transportation Authority Act with respect to the Suburban Bus Board and the Commuter Rail Board.
Title
RTA-CONTINUATION OF BENEFITS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-09 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-30 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0241 |
2023-06-30 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2024 |
2023-06-30 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2023-05-09 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000 |
2023-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson |
2023-05-02 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-05-02 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2023-04-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Norma Hernandez |
2023-04-26 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-04-25 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Regulations, Roads & Bridges; 016-000-000 |
2023-04-20 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid |
2023-04-19 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal |
2023-04-19 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2023-04-18 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Regulations, Roads & Bridges |
2023-04-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-04-11 | House | First Reading |
2023-03-31 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Hoan Huynh |
2023-03-31 | House | Arrived in House |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Simmons |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Transportation; 017-000-000 |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mike Simmons |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2023 |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 9, 2023 |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Do Pass Transportation; 016-000-000 |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mike Simmons |