IL SB1888 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-27 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Re-referred to Assignments; Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b).
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-27 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Re-referred to Assignments; Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b).
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Code of Civil Procedure by adding a new Section. Provides that in civil litigation under any legal theory, execution of the judgment shall be stayed during appellate review upon the posting of a supersedeas bond set in accordance with law or court rules, except that the total supersedeas bond that is required of all appellants collectively shall not exceed $75,000,000, regardless of the judgment amount. Provides that if an appellee proves that an appellant is dissipating assets outside the ordinary course of business to avoid payment of a judgment, a court may require the appellant to post a supersedeas bond in an amount up to the total judgment amount. Effective immediately.
Title
CIV-SUPERSEDEAS BOND
Sponsors
Sen. Kirk Dillard [R] | Sen. Don Harmon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-27 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Re-referred to Assignments; Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b). | |
2010-06-27 | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments | |
2010-05-06 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Executive | |
2010-05-05 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Executive | |
2010-05-05 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments | |
2010-05-05 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon | |
2010-03-26 | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 15, 2010 | |
2010-03-19 | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As March 26, 2010 | |
2010-02-16 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 17, 2010 | |
2010-02-16 | Approved for Consideration Assignments | |
2009-08-15 | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments | |
2009-04-30 | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2009 | |
2009-04-30 | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2009 | |
2009-04-03 | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 30, 2009 | |
2009-03-30 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 31, 2009 | |
2009-03-30 | Second Reading | |
2009-03-11 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kirk W. Dillard | |
2009-03-11 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 12, 2009 | |
2009-03-11 | Do Pass as Amended Judiciary; 011-000-000 | |
2009-03-10 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted | |
2009-03-10 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary | |
2009-03-10 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-10 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon | |
2009-03-04 | Assigned to Judiciary | |
2009-02-20 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-02-20 | First Reading | |
2009-02-20 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1888&GAID=10&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/SB/09600SB1888.htm |