IL SB1858 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Retailers' Occupation Tax Act. Provides that internal (also known as female) and male condoms, incontinence products, diapers, and baby wipes shall be taxed by the State at a rate of 1% (currently, 6.25%). Provides that the net revenue from the 1% tax collected from the sale of those products shall be deposited into the State and Local Sales Tax Reform Fund. Amends the Use Tax, Service Occupation Tax, and Service Occupation Use Tax Acts to make conforming changes.
Title
SALES TAX-REDUCED RATE-CONDOMS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-13 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-05 | House | To Sales, Amusement & Other Taxes Subcommittee |
2020-01-28 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2019-05-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-09 | House | To Sales, Amusement & Other Taxes Subcommittee |
2019-04-11 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Katie Stuart |
2019-04-09 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-03-21 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-21 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-21 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin |
2019-03-13 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 046-003-000 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 12, 2019 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Do Pass Revenue; 007-000-000 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Omar Aquino |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 105 | 3-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 110 | 3-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 115 | 3-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 120 | 2-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |