IL SB1855 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-22 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-22 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that it is unlawful for a person to store or keep any firearm on the premises of a residence under the control of the person if the person knows, or reasonably should know, that: (1) a minor is likely to gain access to the firearm without the permission of the parent or guardian of the minor; or (2) a resident of the residence is ineligible to possess a firearm under federal, State, or local law. Provides exemptions for safe storage of the firearm. Provides that a person who commits a violation is guilty of a petty offense and shall be fined $500 per violation. Provides that if a person violates this provision and a minor or a resident who is ineligible to possess a firearm under federal, State, or local law obtains the firearm and causes injury or death to the minor, resident, or any other individual, the person is guilty of a Class 2 felony. Provides that any firearm stored in violation of this provision is subject to seizure and forfeiture. Repeals provisions relating to child protection.
Title
CRIM CD-FIREARM STORAGE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-03-24 | Senate | To Executive- Firearms |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Ellman |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 24-9 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 24-9.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1855&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB1855.htm |