IL SB1854 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0530
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0530
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. Provides that a group or individual policy of accident and health insurance or managed care plan shall provide coverage for A1C testing recommended by a health care provider for prediabetes, type 1 diabetes, and type 2 diabetes in accordance with prediabetes and diabetes risk factors identified by the United States Centers for Disease Control and Prevention. Provides that a group or individual policy of accident and health insurance or managed care plan shall provide coverage for vitamin D testing recommended by a health care provider in accordance with vitamin D deficiency risk factors identified by the United States Centers for Disease Control and Prevention. Defines "A1C testing" and "vitamin D testing". Makes conforming changes in the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code.
Title
INS-BLOOD TESTING
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-20 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0530 |
2021-08-20 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2022 |
2021-08-20 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-26 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 112-000-000 |
2021-05-21 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2021-05-19 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2021-05-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-13 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-13 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-12 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-11 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Insurance Committee; 019-000-000 |
2021-05-04 | House | Assigned to Insurance Committee |
2021-04-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2021-04-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-27 | House | First Reading |
2021-04-26 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2021-04-23 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John Connor |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 21, 2021 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 25, 2021 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Do Pass Insurance; 013-000-000 |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Assigned to Insurance |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Ellman |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
215 | 5 | 356z.43 | New Code | See Bill Text |
215 | 5 | 356z.44 | New Code | See Bill Text |
305 | 5 | 5-16.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |