IL SB1854 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Vetoed on August 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-25 - Bill Dead - Amendatory Veto
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on August 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-25 - Bill Dead - Amendatory Veto
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the North Shore Sanitary District Act. Changes the title of the Act from the North Shore Sanitary District Act to the North Shore Water Reclamation District Act. Provides that the board of the sanity district may increase the pay of the president and the other members. Provides that the board may enact ordinances regarding rates or charges for the treatment and disposal of sewage and surface or ground water. Allows the board to impose civil fines, liens, and declare a nuisance regarding unlawful discharge of waste into the sewerage system or any sewer tributary. Provides that the sanitary district may sell, dispose of, or otherwise expend recovered resources and renewable energy resources and may construct, maintain, finance, and operate facilities necessary for this purpose. Further provides that the sanitary district may capture recovered resources and produce renewable energy resources from materials previously discarded. Amends the Special Assessment Supplemental Bond and Procedures Act, the Sanitary District Act of 1917, and the Eminent Domain Act making conforming changes. Effective immediately.
Title
NORTH SHORE WATER RECLAMATION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-09-09 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 37 N: 16 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 64 N: 50 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 64 N: 50 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-25 | Senate | Bill Dead - Amendatory Veto |
2015-09-10 | House | Placed on Calendar Amendatory Veto September 10, 2015 |
2015-09-10 | House | Arrived in House |
2015-09-09 | Senate | Override Amendatory Veto - Senate Passed 037-016-000 |
2015-09-09 | Senate | 3/5 Vote Required |
2015-09-09 | Senate | Motion Filed Override Amendatory Veto Sen. Terry Link |
2015-09-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Amendatory Veto |
2015-08-25 | Senate | Governor Amendatory Veto |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2015-05-31 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2015-05-31 | Senate | Senate Concurs 054-000-000 |
2015-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Senate Concurs 054-000-000 |
2015-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 054-000-000 |
2015-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Local Government; 009-000-000 |
2015-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Local Government; 009-000-000 |
2015-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Local Government |
2015-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Local Government |
2015-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2015-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Terry Link |
2015-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2015-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Terry Link |
2015-05-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2, 3 - May 30, 2015 |
2015-05-29 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2, 3 |
2015-05-29 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 064-050-000 |
2015-05-27 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted |
2015-05-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2015-05-27 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ed Sullivan |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2015-05-22 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2015 |
2015-05-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000 |
2015-05-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-05-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2015-05-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 009-000-000 |
2015-05-19 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-19 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2015-05-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-05-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2015-05-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2015-05-13 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 010-000-000 |
2015-05-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-05-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2015-05-08 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 15, 2015 |
2015-05-04 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2015-04-23 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-04-23 | House | First Reading |
2015-04-23 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2015-04-23 | House | Arrived in House |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000 |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Link |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Melinda Bush |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Local Government; 009-000-000 |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Local Government |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 25, 2015 |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 19, 2015 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Do Pass Local Government; 008-000-000 |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-02-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
50 | 460 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
70 | 2305 | 0.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
70 | 2305 | 0.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 2305 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
70 | 2305 | 18.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 2305 | 31 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 2305 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
70 | 2305 | 7.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 2305 | 7.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 2305 | Act title | Amended Code | Citation Text |
70 | 2405 | 17.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
735 | 30 | 15-5-15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |