IL SB1846 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Business Enterprise for Minorities, Women, and Persons with Disabilities Act. Modifies the provisions of the Act to apply to veterans and veteran-owned businesses. Modifies a Section concerning the short title. Changes the title of the Act to the Business Enterprise for Minorities, Women, Veterans, and Persons with Disabilities Act, and makes conforming changes throughout various statutes referencing the title of the Act. Amends the Illinois Procurement Code. Removes a provision concerning procurement preferences for veterans and veteran-owned businesses. Applies administrative penalties for falsely certified businesses to minority-owned businesses, women-owned businesses, veteran-owned businesses, and businesses owned by persons with a disability. Defines terms. Makes conforming changes in various statutes concerning minority-owned businesses, women-owned businesses, veteran-owned businesses, and businesses owned by persons with a disability. Effective immediately.
Title
BUSINESS ENTERPRISE-VETERANS
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Schimpf [R] | Sen. Iris Martinez [D] | Sen. Dale Fowler [R] | Sen. Antonio Munoz [D] |
Sen. Julie Morrison [D] | Sen. Neil Anderson [R] | Sen. John Mulroe [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 To Subcommittee on Governmental Operations |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2019-03-06 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Governmental Operations |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Paul Schimpf |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Paul Schimpf |