IL SB1819 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals the Illinois Roofing Industry Licensing Act. Makes conforming changes in the Regulatory Sunset Act, the Unified Code of Corrections, and the Home Repair and Remodeling Act. Effective immediately.
Title
LICENSED ROOFERS-REPEAL
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Brady [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-09-30 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 335 | Act | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
5 | 80 | 4.36 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 5-5-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
815 | 513 | 18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
815 | 513 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1819&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1819.htm |