IL SB1806 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0419
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0419
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Governmental Account Audit Act, the Counties Code, and the Illinois Municipal Code. Removes definitions of "licensed public accountant" and "accountant". Adds a definition of "generally accepted auditing standards". Modifies the definition of "auditor" to include a substantially equivalent licensed CPA that operates out-of-state. Replaces references to licensed public accountants and accountants with references to auditors. Removes audit report requirements for fiscal years prior to 2019. Modifies audit report requirements for fiscal year 2019 and beyond. Changes various terminology throughout.
Title
LOCAL GOV AUDITING STANDARDS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-16 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0419 |
2019-08-16 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-08-16 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-06-21 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000 |
2019-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-02 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-30 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Cities & Villages Committee; 013-000-000 |
2019-04-09 | House | Assigned to Cities & Villages Committee |
2019-03-21 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-21 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-20 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2019-03-20 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 7, 2019 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Local Government; 009-000-000 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Local Government |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dale A. Righter |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dale A. Righter |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
50 | 310 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
50 | 310 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
50 | 310 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
50 | 310 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
50 | 310 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 5 | 6-31002 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 5 | 6-31003 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 5 | 6-31004 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 5 | 6-31005 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 5 | 6-31006 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 5 | 6-31008 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
65 | 5 | 8-8-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
65 | 5 | 8-8-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
65 | 5 | 8-8-3.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
65 | 5 | 8-8-4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
65 | 5 | 8-8-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
65 | 5 | 8-8-7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
65 | 5 | 8-8-8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |