IL SB1805 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on January 13 2021 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-13 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on January 13 2021 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-13 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Metropolitan Water Reclamation District Act. Provides that in addition to the District's pension contributions from taxes levied, the board of trustees, by a two-thirds vote of all its members, may also transfer revenue from any lawfully available source into the District's funds that are in most need of income.
Title
DOWNSTATE TRANS-DESIGN-BUILD
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-12 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-12 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-12 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 90 N: 22 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-12 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-12 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 90 N: 22 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2021-01-13 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 5 Senate Concurs 054-000-000 |
2021-01-13 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 054-000-000 |
2021-01-13 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 5 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2021-01-13 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2021-01-12 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 5 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2021-01-12 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 5 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Cristina Castro |
2021-01-12 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2021-01-12 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Cristina Castro |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 5 - January 13, 2021 |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 5 |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Cristina Castro |
2021-01-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2021-01-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2021-01-12 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 090-022-001 |
2021-01-12 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-01-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 5 Adopted |
2021-01-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Withdrawn by Rep. Gregory Harris |
2021-01-12 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-01-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 5 Recommends Be Adopted Personnel & Pensions Committee; 010-000-000 |
2021-01-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 5 Rules Refers to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2021-01-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 5 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-01-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 5 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2021-01-02 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-01-02 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-001-000 |
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-05-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-05-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Gregory Harris |
2020-05-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-05-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Gregory Harris |
2020-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2020-05-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 008-005-000 |
2020-05-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2020-05-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-05-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Gregory Harris |
2020-05-21 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Gregory Harris |
2020-05-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2020-05-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2020-05-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2020-05-21 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 008-005-000 |
2020-05-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote |
2020-05-21 | House | Legislation Considered in Special Session No. 1 |
2020-05-20 | House | Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2020-05-20 | House | Moved to Suspend Rule 21 Rep. Gregory Harris |
2020-05-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2020-05-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Moved to Suspend Rule 21 Rep. Gregory Harris |
2020-05-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2020-05-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-05-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Gregory Harris; ; was filed before 3 pm |
2020-05-18 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2020-05-10 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2019-05-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-30 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2019-04-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-11 | House | First Reading |
2019-04-11 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2019-04-11 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 28, 2019 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2019 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Do Pass Transportation; 017-000-000 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Postponed - Transportation |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 740 | 2-19 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 740 | 3-9.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 740 | 4-6 | New Code | See Bill Text |