IL SB1785 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-01-12 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-01-12 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. In provisions concerning child care co-payments, provides that the amount of a family's co-payment shall not exceed the sum of certain percentages of the family's countable income, based on the relationship of that income to the federal poverty level. Provides that a family with countable income below 50% of the federal poverty level shall have a co-payment of $1 per week. Effective immediately.
Title
DHS-PUBLIC AID-CHILD CARE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-01-12 | Session Sine Die | |
2009-03-13 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-11 | To Human Services Subcommittee on Medicaid & Provider Rate Reform | |
2009-03-04 | Assigned to Human Services | |
2009-02-20 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-02-20 | First Reading | |
2009-02-20 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1785&GAID=10&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/SB/09600SB1785.htm |