IL SB1782 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Identification Act. Provides that the State's Attorney shall petition the circuit court when the arrest or charge not initiated by arrest sought to be expunged is for retail theft of property the full retail value of which does not exceed $300; criminal trespass to real property; criminal trespass to State supported land; a traffic offense, except for any offense involving fleeing or attempting to elude a peace officer or aggravated fleeing or attempting to elude a peace officer, driving under the influence, or any offense that results in bodily harm; or a Class 4 felony violation of the Illinois Controlled Substances Act which results in acquittal, dismissal, or the reversal or vacation of a conviction immediately upon the State's Attorney not to charge or upon entry of acquittal, dismissal, reversal, or vacation. Provides that the circuit court shall promptly enter an order within 90 days upon the filing of a petition under this provision.
Title
CRIM ID-PROMPT EXPUNGEMENT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2017-08-04 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2017 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 16, 2017 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Criminal Law; 010-000-000 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 2630 | 5.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |