IL SB1777 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Opportunity Scholarship Act and amends the State Finance Act and the Illinois Income Tax Act. Establishes the Opportunity Scholarship Program. Provides that under the program the custodian of a qualifying pupil is entitled to a Opportunity Scholarship to pay for qualified education expenses at participating nonpublic elementary schools in Cook County. Sets forth provisions concerning notification of scholarships, a request for a scholarship, the issuance and payment of a scholarship, the amount of a scholarship, the renewal of a scholarship, pupil assessment, the longitudinal data system, reporting attendance, nonpublic school students, a report on the program and expansion of the program, penalties, and rules. Provides that the amount received under the program shall not be considered base income for purposes of Illinois' income tax. Creates the Opportunity Scholarship Fund as a special fund in the State treasury, with money in the Fund being used by the State Board of Education for the purposes of the Opportunity Scholarship Act. Provides for a tax credit for contributions made to the Opportunity Scholarship Fund. Effective immediately.
Title
OPPORTUNITY SCHOLARSHIPS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 19, 2013 |
2013-03-06 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Special Issues (RV) |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael Connelly |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 105 | 5.826 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 5 | 203 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 5 | 224 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1777&GAID=12&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/SB/09800SB1777.htm |