IL SB1748 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-27 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-27 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Probate Act of 1975. Provides that a claim for punitive damages survives in an action that survives.
Title
PROBATE-SURVIVAL OF ACTIONS
Sponsors
Sen. Terry Link [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-27 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Postponed - Judiciary |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Postponed - Judiciary |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Terry Link |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-02-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
755 | 5 | 27-6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1748&GAID=13&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/SB/09900SB1748.htm |