IL SB1731 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-2)
Status: Enrolled on May 23 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. With regard to the in-service training program on the warning signs of mental illness and suicidal behavior in youth, provides that the program must utilize evidence-based training that educates the participants on (i) recognizing the signs and symptoms of mental illness and substance use disorders, including common psychiatric conditions such as schizophrenia, bipolar disorder, major clinical depression, and anxiety disorders and common substance use disorders such as opioids and alcohol, (ii) providing referrals to mental health or substance use disorder services or other support to individuals in the early stages of developing a mental illness or substance use disorder, recommending resources available in the community for individuals with a mental illness or substance use disorder, and recommending any other relevant resources, and (iii) ensuring the safe de-escalation of crisis situations involving individuals with a mental illness. Provides that a school district may utilize the Mental Health First Aid training program to provide the training.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-MENTAL HEALTH AWARENESS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2019-05-23SenatePassed Both Houses
2019-05-23HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000
2019-05-16HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-16HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-09HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-08HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School; 007-000-000
2019-05-07HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2019-05-03HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith
2019-05-03HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2019-05-02HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2019-05-02HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2019-05-02HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi
2019-05-02HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz
2019-05-02HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes
2019-05-02HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2019-05-02HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Yehiel M. Kalish
2019-05-02HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa
2019-05-02HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva
2019-05-02HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2019-04-30HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School
2019-04-12HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-04-12HouseFirst Reading
2019-04-12HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
2019-04-12HouseArrived in House
2019-04-12SenateThird Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
2019-04-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2019
2019-04-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Koehler
2019-04-10SenateSecond Reading
2019-04-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 010-000-000
2019-04-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education
2019-04-05SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2019-04-05SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-04-05SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler
2019-04-04SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2019-04-04SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2019-04-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2019-03-29SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2019-03-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2019-03-19SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
2019-03-14SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2019-03-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2019
2019-03-12SenateDo Pass Education; 015-000-000
2019-03-06SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
2019-02-27SenateAssigned to Education
2019-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105510-22.39Amended CodeCitation Text
105534-18.7Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback