IL SB1708 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-07 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that as a condition of initial eligibility for any benefits under the Code, an applicant must pass a drug screening. Provides that as a condition of continued eligibility for benefits, a recipient must pass random drug screenings as prescribed by the Department of Human Services or the Department of Healthcare and Family Services. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PUBLIC AID-DRUG SCREENING

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-07SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-03-29SenatePostponed - Subcommittee on Special Issues
2017-03-17SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
2017-03-08SenateTo Subcommittee on Special Issues (HS)
2017-03-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Human Services
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
30551-10.5New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback