IL SB1705 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 25 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0727
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 25 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0727
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Chicago Firefighters Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Requires that a disabled fireman who is receiving a duty, occupational disease, or ordinary disability benefit be examined on a periodic basis as determined by the Board, but at least once a year (was, at least once a year). Provides that if a fireman refuses to submit to such medical, surgical, or hospital treatment as is reasonably essential to promote his recovery from disability, he shall have no further right to receive the benefit. Provides a window during which a fireman who re-entered service and failed to repay his refund within the required 2-year period may repay the refund. Provides that a fireman who has failed to repay any refund due to the Fund after re-entering service shall be treated as a new employee and shall only receive service credit from the date that he has re-entered service as a new employee. Provides that, in those cases where the injury or death for which a disability or death benefit is payable was caused under circumstances creating a legal liability on the part of some person or entity to pay damages to the fireman, then legal proceedings may be taken against such other person or entity to recover damages notwithstanding the Fund's payment of or liability to pay disability or death benefits. Provides that the Fund may join in any action brought by the disabled fireman or his personal representative. Amends the State Mandates Act to require implementation without reimbursement.
Title
PEN CD-ART 6-DISABLED FIREMAN
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-05-29 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-14 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 104 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-14 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 104 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-25 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0727 | |
2009-08-25 | Effective Date August 25, 2009 | |
2009-08-25 | Governor Approved | |
2009-06-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-29 | Passed Both Houses | |
2009-05-29 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 057-000-000 | |
2009-05-26 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Pensions and Investments; 006-000-000 | |
2009-05-22 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Pensions and Investments | |
2009-05-19 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments | |
2009-05-19 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Kwame Raoul | |
2009-05-15 | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 17, 2009 | |
2009-05-15 | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 | |
2009-05-14 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 104-001-000 | |
2009-05-14 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Donald L. Moffitt | |
2009-05-14 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke | |
2009-05-14 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski | |
2009-05-14 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. James D. Brosnahan | |
2009-05-14 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin Joyce | |
2009-05-14 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe | |
2009-05-14 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John D'Amico | |
2009-05-12 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-05-12 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-05-07 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-05-07 | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Personnel and Pensions Committee; 009-000-000 | |
2009-05-07 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Personnel and Pensions Committee; by Voice Vote | |
2009-05-07 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Personnel and Pensions Committee | |
2009-04-14 | Assigned to Personnel and Pensions Committee | |
2009-04-01 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-04-01 | First Reading | |
2009-04-01 | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Joseph M. Lyons | |
2009-04-01 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2009-04-01 | Arrived in House | |
2009-04-01 | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 | |
2009-04-01 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval | |
2009-04-01 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading | |
2009-04-01 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Raoul | |
2009-04-01 | Recalled to Second Reading | |
2009-03-31 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Pensions and Investments; 009-000-000 | |
2009-03-30 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Pensions and Investments | |
2009-03-25 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-25 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul | |
2009-03-24 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 25, 2009 | |
2009-03-24 | Second Reading | |
2009-03-12 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 17, 2009 | |
2009-03-12 | Do Pass as Amended Pensions and Investments; 006-000-000 | |
2009-03-12 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted | |
2009-03-10 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Pensions and Investments | |
2009-03-10 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-10 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul | |
2009-03-04 | Assigned to Pensions and Investments | |
2009-02-19 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-02-19 | First Reading | |
2009-02-19 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul |