IL SB1703 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning construction of the Code.
Title
MEDICAID-MANAGED CARE APPEALS
Sponsors
Sen. Don Harmon [D] | Sen. Iris Martinez [D] | Sen. Kimberly Lightford [D] | Sen. Andy Manar [D] |
Sen. Elgie Sims [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 31, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 29, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 5, 2020 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Executive; 016-000-000 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Re-referred to Executive |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Special Committee on Oversight of Medicaid Managed Care |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 5 | 5-30.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |