IL SB1703 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Public Utilities Act. Provides for a waste-to-energy electric generation program. Requires every investor-owned public utility to file with the Illinois Commerce Commission a standard tariff for electricity purchased from an electric generation facility. Provides that the Commission may limit the projects to 2 standard tariffs per territory in Illinois. Provides requirements for the use of the applicable tariffs, and accompanying costs. Provides that the Commission shall adopt any rules necessary to implement the program. Defines "electric generation facility". Effective immediately.
Title
UTILITIES-TECH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2017-08-04 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2017 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Energy and Public Utilities; 010-000-000 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Energy and Public Utilities |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Neil Anderson |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Energy and Public Utilities |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Neil Anderson |