IL SB1679 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that beginning in State fiscal year 2020, the specified income threshold shall be no less than 200% of the then-current federal poverty level for each family size. Effective July 1, 2019.
Title
DHS-CHILD CARE-INCOME LEVELS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Laura Fine |
2020-01-20 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon |
2019-11-04 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 9, 2019 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2019 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Do Pass Human Services; 006-001-000 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Reported Back To Human Services; 002-001-000 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2019-03-05 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Special Issues (HS) |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 5 | 9A-11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
305 | 5 | 9A-2a | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1679&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1679.htm |