IL SB1661 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois the Department of State Police Law. Amends the Uniform Peace Officers' Disciplinary Act. Provides that it shall not be a requirement of a person filing a complaint against a State Police Officer to have a complaint supported by a sworn affidavit or any other legal documentation (rather than anyone filing a complaint filing a complaint against a State Police Officer must have the complaint supported by a sworn affidavit). Provides that it shall not be a requirement of a person filing a complaint against a sworn peace officer to have the complaint supported by a sworn affidavit or any other legal documentation (rather than anyone filing a complaint against a sworn peace officer must have the complaint supported by a sworn affidavit).
Title
COMPLAINTS-PEACE OFFICERS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 5, 2017 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 2610 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
50 | 725 | 3.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1661&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1661.htm |