IL SB1656 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-26 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-26 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Internet Gaming Act. Authorizes an Internet gaming operator to offer Internet gaming in accordance with the provisions of the Act. Provides that Internet gaming shall only be offered by an Internet gaming license or an Internet management services provider that has contracted with an Internet gaming licensee. Provides that an internet gaming licensee shall offer no more than 3 individually branded Internet gaming skins. Provides that an Internet management services provider may conduct Internet gaming on its own Internet gaming platform pursuant to the agreement between the provider and an Internet gaming licensee and in accordance with the rules of the Board and the provisions of the Act. Includes provisions for: requirements of an Internet gaming platform; Internet waging accounts; license requirements; age verification, location, and responsible gaming; diversity goals in procurement and spending by Internet gaming licensees; acceptance of out-of-state wagers; and limitations on home rule units. Provides that a 15% privilege tax is imposed on Internet gaming to be deposited into the State Gaming Fund. Authorizes the adoption of emergency rules to implement the Act and makes conforming changes in the Illinois Administrative Procedure Act. Effective immediately.
Title
INTERNET GAMING ACT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-26 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2024-05-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 26, 2024 |
2024-05-24 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2024 |
2024-05-17 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 24, 2024 |
2024-05-03 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 17, 2024 |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2024 |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 3, 2024 |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 5, 2024 |
2024-02-08 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Gaming, Wagering, and Racing |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Re-assigned to Executive |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-02-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1656&GAID=17&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/SB/10300SB1656.htm |