IL SB1656 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0216
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0216
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill with the following changes: Amends the Environmental Protection Act. Provides that a pollution control facility does not include the portion of a site or facility used during a mass animal mortality event, where such waste is collected, stored, processed, disposed, or incinerated under a mass animal mortality event plan issued by the Department of Agriculture. Provides that the Environmental Protection Agency shall not require a permit for any person conducting a waste transfer, storage, treatment, or disposal operation, including, but not limited to, a waste transfer or waste composting operation, under a mass animal mortality event plan created by the Department. Provides that if a mass animal mortality event is declared by the Department, the owner or operator responsible for the disposal of dead animals is exempted from obtaining a permit for the construction, installation, or operation of specified facilities or equipment; a permit for open burning; and the registering the disposal of dead animals as an eligible small source with the Agency. Provides that as applicable, the owner or operator responsible for the disposal of dead animals is required to obtain a National Pollutant Discharge Elimination System permit; a prevention of significant deterioration permit; a nonattainment area new source review permit; a federally enforceable state operating permit; and a Clean Air Act Permit Program permit.
Title
MASS ANIMAL MORTALITY EVENT
Sponsors
Sen. Patrick Joyce [D] | Sen. Darren Bailey [R] | Rep. Sonya Harper [D] | Rep. Dan Caulkins [R] |
Rep. Camille Lilly [D] | Sen. Andrew Chesney [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-30 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0216 |
2021-07-30 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2022 |
2021-07-30 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-26 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 112-000-000 |
2021-05-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2021-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2021-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2021-05-21 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2021-05-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-13 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-13 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-12 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-11 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 007-000-000 |
2021-05-04 | House | Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2021-04-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-27 | House | First Reading |
2021-04-26 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2021-04-26 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** April 21, 2021 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 20, 2021 |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Agriculture; 011-000-000 |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Agriculture |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Patrick J. Joyce |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Postponed - Agriculture |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Agriculture |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Agriculture |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Patrick J. Joyce |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Postponed - Agriculture |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Darren Bailey |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Assigned to Agriculture |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Patrick J. Joyce |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 610 | 1.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 610 | 17.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
225 | 610 | 19a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 48-7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |