IL SB1645 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Deferred Compensation Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that "eligible sponsoring entity" means a school district organized under the Chicago School District Article of the School Code; the City of Chicago as the sponsoring entity for the City of Chicago Deferred Compensation Plan; or Cook County as the sponsoring entity for the Cook County Deferred Compensation Plan. Authorizes an eligible sponsoring entity to automatically enroll employees in its deferred compensation program. Provides that the eligible sponsoring entity shall continue to be subject to specified fiduciary duty provisions under the General Provisions Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that an employee who is automatically enrolled in the deferred compensation program shall contribute 3% of his or her pretax gross compensation for each compensation period into his or her account. Removes language providing that the provisions authorizing local government deferred compensation plans does not limit the power or authority of any unit of local government, school district, or any institution supported in whole or in part by public funds to establish and administer any other deferred compensation plans that may be authorized by law and deemed appropriate by the officials of such subdivisions or institutions. Contains provisions concerning fiduciary duties; availability of multiple plans or programs; elections not to participate; refunds; and increases to the default contribution rate. Effective immediately.
Title
PEN CD-DEFERRED COMPENSATION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-01-07 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 31, 2023 |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate Special Committee on Pensions |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-02-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert F. Martwick |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 5 | 24-107 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1645&GAID=17&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/SB/10300SB1645.htm |