IL SB1633 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-1080
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-1080
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Nursing Home Care Act. Provides that residents shall have the right to be treated with courtesy and respect for their individuality by employees or persons providing medical services or care and shall have their human and civil rights maintained in all aspects of medical care. Provides that residents shall not perform labor or services for a facility unless those activities are included for therapeutic purposes and appropriately goal-related in the resident's individual medical record. Provides that every facility shall have a written internal grievance procedure that, at a minimum: (1) sets forth the process to be followed; (2) specifies time limits, including time limits for facility response; (3) informs residents of their right to have the assistance of an advocate; (4) provides for a timely response by an impartial decision maker if the grievance is not otherwise resolved; (5) requires the facility to follow applicable State and federal requirements for responding to and reporting any grievance alleging potential abuse, neglect, misappropriation of resident property, or exploitation; and (6) requires the facility to keep a copy of all grievances, responses, and outcomes for 3 years and provide the information to the Department of Public Health upon request. Requires a facility to post specified information concerning rights protection services and where complaints may be lodged. Provides that a facility shall include a link to the Long-Term Care Ombudsman Program's website on the home page of the facility's website. Makes other changes.
Title
NURSING HOMES-RESIDENT RIGHTS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-10 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-1080 |
2022-06-10 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2023 |
2022-06-10 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2022-04-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2022-03-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000 |
2022-03-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2022-03-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2022-03-22 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
2022-03-16 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-16 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 015-000-000 |
2022-03-14 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2022-03-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
2022-03-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2022-03-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2022-03-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2022-03-07 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2022-03-01 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-01 | House | First Reading |
2022-02-28 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2022-02-28 | House | Arrived in House |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 050-000-000 |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Adopted; Villa |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Referred to Assignments |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Karina Villa |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8 (b-1), the following amendments will remain in the Committee on Assignments. |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Karina Villa |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 15, 2022 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8 (b-1), the following amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments. |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Karina Villa |
2022-01-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Health |
2022-01-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading January 5, 2022 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2021-07-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Health |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Karina Villa |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 15, 2021 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Health; 014-000-000 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Health |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Karina Villa |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Reported Back To Health; 005-000-000 |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Postponed - Health |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2021-03-16 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Long-Term Care & Aging |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Assigned to Health |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Karina Villa |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
210 | 45 | 2-101 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
210 | 45 | 2-104 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
210 | 45 | 2-112 | Amended Code | Citation Text |