IL SB1609 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-31 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-31 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Prevailing Wage Act. Provides that the definition of "public works" also includes the removal, hauling, and transportation of biosolids, lime sludge, and lime residue from a water treatment plant or facility and the disposal of biosolids, lime sludge, and lime residue removed from a water treatment plant or facility at a landfill.
Title
PREVAILING WAGE-BIOSOLIDS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-31 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 23, 2023 |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Do Pass Labor; 011-003-000 |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 24, 2023 |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to Labor |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Porfirio |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-02-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
820 | 130 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1609&GAID=17&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/SB/10300SB1609.htm |