IL SB1606 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0282
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0282
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Condominium Property Act. Makes a technical change in the short title Section.
Title
CONDOMINIUM INSTRUMENTS-AMEND
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-09 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0282 |
2013-08-09 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2014 |
2013-08-09 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2013-05-15 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 |
2013-05-09 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-09 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-08 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary; 016-000-000 |
2013-04-30 | House | Assigned to Judiciary |
2013-04-30 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-04-30 | House | First Reading |
2013-04-30 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2013-04-24 | House | Arrived in House |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 23, 2013 |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 18, 2013 |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Judiciary; 010-000-000 |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Judiciary |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Postponed - Judiciary |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 19, 2013 |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-02-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
765 | 605 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |